Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 09/28/1999
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 10/05/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 10/05/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 10/05/1999
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 10/14/1999
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 10/14/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 10/20/1999
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/27/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 10/28/1999
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/28/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/28/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 11/02/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 11/02/1999
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 11/02/1999
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 11/02/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 11/02/1999
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 11/03/1999
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 11/04/1999
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 11/04/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 11/04/1999
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 11/04/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 11/16/1999
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 11/16/1999
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/16/1999
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 11/16/1999
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/17/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 02/08/2000
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 02/08/2000
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 02/08/2000
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/08/2000
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/08/2000
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/08/2000
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/08/2000
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 02/29/2000
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/29/2000
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/08/2000
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/09/2000
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 03/16/2000
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 03/16/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/16/2000
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/21/2000
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 03/29/2000
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 04/06/2000
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/03/2000
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 05/03/2000
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 05/16/2000
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/08/2000
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 06/27/2000
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 09/13/2000
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 09/13/2000
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/26/2000
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 09/26/2000
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 10/06/2000