Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/09/1999
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/09/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 02/09/1999
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/09/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/09/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/09/1999
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 02/09/1999
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 02/09/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/09/1999
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/23/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/23/1999
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 03/03/1999
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 03/03/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/03/1999
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 03/10/1999
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/10/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/17/1999
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 03/17/1999
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/23/1999
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/25/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/25/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 04/12/1999
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/12/1999
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/12/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 04/12/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 04/12/1999
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/12/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 04/12/1999
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 04/12/1999
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/12/1999
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 04/12/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/12/1999
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/12/1999
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/14/1999
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 04/14/1999
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 04/14/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/21/1999
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/21/1999
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/21/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/21/1999
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 04/21/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 04/21/1999
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/21/1999
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 04/28/1999
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/28/1999
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/28/1999
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 04/28/1999
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 04/28/1999
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/28/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/28/1999
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/28/1999
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 04/28/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/28/1999
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 04/28/1999
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 04/28/1999
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 04/28/1999
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/03/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 05/04/1999
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/04/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 05/04/1999
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 05/04/1999
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/04/1999
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/04/1999
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/04/1999
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/04/1999
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 05/05/1999
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 05/05/1999
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 05/05/1999
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 05/05/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/05/1999
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 05/05/1999
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/05/1999
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 05/05/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/12/1999
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 05/12/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 05/12/1999
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 05/12/1999
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 05/12/1999
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 05/12/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 05/12/1999
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/12/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 05/12/1999
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/12/1999
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/12/1999
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/12/1999
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 05/19/1999
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 05/19/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/19/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/19/1999
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/19/1999
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 05/19/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 05/19/1999
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 05/19/1999
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 05/19/1999
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 05/19/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/19/1999
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 05/19/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/19/1999
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 05/19/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 05/19/1999
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/19/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/25/1999
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 05/25/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 05/25/1999
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 06/08/1999
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 06/08/1999
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 06/08/1999
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 06/08/1999
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 06/08/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/08/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/08/1999
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/08/1999
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 06/08/1999
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 06/08/1999
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/08/1999
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 06/08/1999
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/08/1999
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/08/1999
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 06/08/1999
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 06/08/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/09/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/09/1999
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 06/09/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 06/16/1999
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/16/1999
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 06/16/1999
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 06/16/1999
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/16/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/16/1999
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/16/1999
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 06/16/1999
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/29/1999
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/29/1999
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 06/29/1999
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 06/29/1999
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 06/29/1999
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 06/29/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/29/1999
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 07/12/1999
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/12/1999
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 07/12/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 07/12/1999
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 07/12/1999
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/12/1999
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 07/12/1999
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/19/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 07/19/1999
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/19/1999
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 07/22/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/27/1999
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 07/29/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 08/03/1999
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 08/03/1999
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 08/05/1999
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 08/05/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 08/05/1999
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 08/05/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 09/09/1999
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 09/09/1999
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/09/1999
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/09/1999
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 09/13/1999
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 09/13/1999
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 09/22/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/04/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 10/04/1999
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 10/04/1999
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 10/04/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 10/04/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 10/06/1999
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 10/14/1999
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 10/14/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 10/14/1999
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 10/18/1999
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 10/18/1999
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 10/18/1999
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/18/1999
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 10/19/1999
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 10/21/1999
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 10/21/1999
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 10/21/1999
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 10/21/1999
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 10/21/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 11/01/1999
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 11/01/1999
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 11/01/1999
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 11/03/1999
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 11/03/1999
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 11/04/1999
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 11/04/1999
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 11/17/1999
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 02/10/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/10/2000
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 02/10/2000
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/10/2000
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 02/10/2000
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 04/10/2000
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 04/10/2000