Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 08/05/1999
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 09/24/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 10/01/1999
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 10/12/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/25/1999
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/08/1999
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 11/08/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 01/27/2000
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 01/27/2000
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 01/27/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 01/27/2000
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 02/14/2000
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 04/03/2000
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 05/02/2000
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/19/2000
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/25/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/25/2000
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/06/2000
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/06/2000
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/06/2000
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/21/2000
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/10/2000
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/10/2000
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/27/2000
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/27/2000
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/27/2000
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/20/2000
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/28/2000
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/28/2000
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/28/2000
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 10/10/2000
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 10/17/2000
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 10/24/2000
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/26/2000
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/31/2000
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 10/31/2000