Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 08/05/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 08/05/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 08/05/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 09/27/1999
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/27/1999
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 03/22/2000
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/22/2000
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 05/10/2000
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 05/24/2000