Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 08/05/1999
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 10/06/1999
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 10/06/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/06/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/12/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 10/12/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/14/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/20/1999
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 10/20/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 10/21/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/26/1999
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/26/1999
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/28/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 10/28/1999
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/04/1999
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 11/17/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 11/17/1999
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 01/24/2000
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 01/27/2000
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 02/08/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/08/2000
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/16/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/16/2000
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 03/06/2000
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/06/2000
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/06/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 03/06/2000
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/08/2000
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/28/2000
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 03/28/2000
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/12/2000
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/04/2000