Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 08/05/1999
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 08/05/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 10/06/1999
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 10/07/1999
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 10/14/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 10/14/1999
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 10/21/1999
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 10/21/1999
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 10/21/1999
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 11/08/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 02/16/2000
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 09/07/2000