Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 08/05/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19]* 08/05/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 09/08/1999
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 09/13/1999
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 09/13/1999
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 09/30/1999
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 10/26/1999
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 02/10/2000
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 03/21/2000
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/28/2000
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 09/12/2000
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 09/12/2000

Show cosponsors who withdrew