Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 08/05/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/09/1999
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 09/09/1999
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 09/09/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 09/23/1999
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 10/06/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 10/14/1999
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 10/19/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 11/01/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 11/17/1999
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/17/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 11/17/1999
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 11/17/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 11/17/1999
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 02/10/2000
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/10/2000
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 02/10/2000
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 02/16/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/23/2000
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/28/2000
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 04/10/2000
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1] 04/10/2000
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/03/2000
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 05/03/2000
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 05/03/2000
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 05/25/2000
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/06/2000
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/06/2000
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/06/2000
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 06/06/2000
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 06/06/2000
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/06/2000
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/06/2000
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 06/08/2000
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/08/2000
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/12/2000
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 06/19/2000
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 06/19/2000
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 06/22/2000
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/12/2000
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/25/2000
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/19/2000
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 09/27/2000
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 10/11/2000