Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 08/05/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 10/07/1999
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 10/07/1999
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 10/07/1999
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 10/07/1999
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 10/07/1999
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 11/02/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 11/02/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 11/02/1999
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 11/02/1999
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 11/02/1999
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 11/02/1999
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 11/02/1999
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 11/02/1999
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 11/02/1999
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 11/02/1999
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 11/02/1999
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 11/02/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 11/02/1999
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 11/02/1999
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 11/02/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 11/02/1999
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 11/02/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 11/02/1999
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/02/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/02/1999
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 11/02/1999
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 11/02/1999
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 11/02/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 11/02/1999
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 11/02/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 11/02/1999
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 11/02/1999
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/02/1999
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 11/18/1999
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/13/2000
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/25/2000