Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 09/08/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 09/08/1999
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1]* 09/08/1999
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 09/08/1999
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 09/13/1999
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 09/13/1999
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 09/13/1999
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/15/1999
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 09/15/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 09/15/1999
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 09/15/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 09/15/1999
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 09/21/1999
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 09/21/1999
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 09/21/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 09/27/1999
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/27/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/30/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 09/30/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 09/30/1999
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 10/06/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 10/06/1999
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 10/07/1999
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 10/20/1999
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 10/28/1999
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 10/28/1999
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 10/28/1999
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 11/03/1999
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/07/2000
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 02/29/2000
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 03/08/2000
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 03/14/2000
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 03/21/2000
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/21/2000
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 03/22/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/22/2000
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/22/2000
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 03/23/2000
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 03/27/2000
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/28/2000
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 03/28/2000
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 03/28/2000
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 03/29/2000
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 04/03/2000
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/04/2000
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 05/09/2000
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 05/17/2000
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/23/2000
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/12/2000
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/20/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 06/21/2000
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/21/2000
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 06/23/2000
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 06/26/2000
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 06/27/2000
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 06/28/2000
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/28/2000
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/28/2000
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/10/2000
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 07/10/2000
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/13/2000
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/24/2000
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/06/2000
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/13/2000
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 09/20/2000
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 09/26/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/27/2000
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 10/02/2000
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/03/2000