Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/12/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 10/12/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 10/12/1999
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/22/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 04/13/2000
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/13/2000
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 05/10/2000
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 05/24/2000