Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/28/1999
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 11/08/1999
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 11/08/1999
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 11/08/1999
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 11/08/1999
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 11/08/1999
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 11/08/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 11/08/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 11/08/1999
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 11/08/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 11/08/1999
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 11/08/1999
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 11/08/1999
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 11/08/1999
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 11/08/1999
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 11/08/1999
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 11/08/1999
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 11/08/1999
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 11/08/1999
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 11/08/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 11/08/1999
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 11/08/1999
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 11/08/1999
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 11/08/1999
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 11/08/1999
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 11/08/1999
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 11/08/1999
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 11/08/1999
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 11/08/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 11/08/1999
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2] 11/08/1999
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 11/08/1999
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 11/08/1999
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 11/08/1999
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 11/08/1999
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 11/08/1999
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 11/08/1999
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 11/08/1999
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 11/17/1999
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 02/01/2000
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/08/2000
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 03/08/2000
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/09/2000
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 03/09/2000
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 03/16/2000
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 03/16/2000
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 03/16/2000
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 03/23/2000
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/28/2000
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 05/02/2000
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 09/14/2000
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 09/21/2000
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 09/26/2000
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/26/2000