Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 09/21/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 09/21/1999
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 09/21/1999
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 09/21/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 09/21/1999
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 09/21/1999
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 09/21/1999
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 09/21/1999
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 10/01/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 10/06/1999
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 10/06/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 10/06/1999
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/06/1999
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 10/12/1999
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/12/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 10/12/1999
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/27/1999
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 10/27/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/27/1999
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 11/16/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 11/17/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 01/27/2000
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 02/14/2000
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 02/14/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/08/2000
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 03/08/2000
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/09/2000
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 03/14/2000
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/22/2000
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 03/22/2000
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 03/28/2000
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 03/28/2000
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 03/28/2000
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/30/2000
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 04/05/2000
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 04/10/2000
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 05/03/2000
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 05/03/2000
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 05/10/2000
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 05/11/2000
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 05/16/2000
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/16/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 05/19/2000
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 05/23/2000
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 05/24/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/25/2000
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 05/25/2000
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/25/2000
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 06/06/2000
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/06/2000
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/07/2000
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 06/09/2000
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/09/2000
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/20/2000
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 06/23/2000
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/27/2000
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/10/2000
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/13/2000
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 07/13/2000
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 07/13/2000
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 07/13/2000
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/17/2000
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/17/2000
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 07/19/2000
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 07/19/2000
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 07/26/2000
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 07/27/2000
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 09/06/2000
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 09/06/2000
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/06/2000
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 09/06/2000
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/12/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 10/04/2000