Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 09/21/1999
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 09/28/1999
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 09/28/1999
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/28/1999
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 09/28/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/28/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/28/1999
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 09/28/1999
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/28/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/28/1999
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/28/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 09/28/1999
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/28/1999
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/28/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/28/1999
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 09/28/1999
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/28/1999
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 09/28/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 10/05/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/05/1999
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/05/1999
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/05/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/05/1999
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 10/05/1999
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/05/1999
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/05/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/05/1999
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 10/05/1999
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/05/1999
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/05/1999
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/05/1999
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 10/05/1999
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 10/05/1999
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 10/12/1999
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 10/12/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 10/12/1999
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 10/12/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 10/12/1999
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/12/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 10/12/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 10/12/1999
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/12/1999
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/21/1999
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 10/21/1999
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/21/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/21/1999
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/21/1999
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/21/1999
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 11/01/1999
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 11/01/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/01/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 11/01/1999
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 11/10/1999
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/10/1999
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 11/10/1999
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 11/16/1999
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 11/16/1999
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 11/16/1999
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 11/16/1999
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large] 11/17/1999
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 11/17/1999
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 11/17/1999
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 11/17/1999
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 11/17/1999
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 11/18/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1] 11/18/1999
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/18/1999
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 11/18/1999
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 11/18/1999
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 11/18/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 11/18/1999
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 11/18/1999
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 11/18/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 11/18/1999
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 11/18/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 11/18/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 11/18/1999
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 11/22/1999
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 03/08/2000
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/03/2000
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/03/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/15/2000
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 07/10/2000
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/24/2000
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 07/26/2000
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/27/2000
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/27/2000
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/27/2000