Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 10/07/1999
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 10/07/1999
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 10/07/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 10/14/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/28/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 10/28/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 11/05/1999
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 01/31/2000
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 01/31/2000
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 02/10/2000
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 02/10/2000
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 02/10/2000
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/01/2000
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1] 03/28/2000
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/28/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 03/28/2000
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 04/06/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/06/2000
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/04/2000
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 05/04/2000
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/11/2000
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 09/14/2000
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 10/06/2000
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 10/06/2000
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 10/06/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 10/06/2000
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/19/2000

Show cosponsors who withdrew