Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 09/22/1999
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 09/22/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 09/22/1999
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7]* 09/22/1999
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 09/22/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 09/22/1999
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 09/22/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 09/22/1999
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 09/22/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 09/22/1999
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 09/22/1999
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 09/22/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1]* 09/22/1999
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 09/22/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 09/22/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 09/22/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 09/22/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 09/22/1999
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 09/22/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 09/22/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 09/22/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 09/22/1999
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 09/22/1999
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 09/22/1999
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 09/22/1999
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 09/22/1999
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 09/22/1999
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 09/22/1999
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 09/22/1999
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 09/22/1999
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 09/22/1999
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 09/22/1999
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 09/22/1999
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 09/22/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 09/22/1999
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 09/22/1999
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 10/06/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/06/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 10/06/1999
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 10/06/1999
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 10/06/1999
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 10/19/1999
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 10/19/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 10/19/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/20/2000
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 04/10/2000
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 04/11/2000
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 05/18/2000
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 06/06/2000
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/06/2000
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 06/07/2000