Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 09/24/1999
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 09/24/1999
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 09/24/1999
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 09/24/1999
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 09/24/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2]* 09/24/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 09/24/1999
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 09/24/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 09/24/1999
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 09/24/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 09/24/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 09/24/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 09/24/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 09/24/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 09/24/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 09/24/1999
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 09/24/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 09/24/1999
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 09/24/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 09/24/1999
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 09/24/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 09/24/1999
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 09/24/1999
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 09/24/1999
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 09/24/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 09/24/1999
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 09/24/1999
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/18/1999
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 10/18/1999
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 10/28/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 10/28/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 11/02/1999
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 02/01/2000
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/01/2000
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 02/01/2000
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 02/01/2000
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 02/01/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 05/09/2000
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 05/09/2000
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 05/09/2000
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/24/2000
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/24/2000
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 05/24/2000
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 05/24/2000