Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 09/27/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 09/27/1999
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 09/27/1999
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 09/27/1999
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 09/27/1999
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 09/27/1999
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 09/27/1999
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 09/27/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 09/27/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 10/14/1999
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/14/1999
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 10/14/1999
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 11/02/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 11/02/1999
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 11/05/1999
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 11/18/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 03/16/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/16/2000
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/16/2000
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 03/16/2000
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 03/28/2000
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/06/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/06/2000
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/06/2000
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 04/11/2000
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 04/11/2000
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 05/04/2000
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 05/04/2000
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 05/16/2000
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 05/16/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/16/2000
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/16/2000
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 05/23/2000
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 05/23/2000
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 06/09/2000
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 06/09/2000
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 06/19/2000
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 06/19/2000
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/19/2000
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/19/2000
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 07/11/2000
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 07/11/2000
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/11/2000
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 07/11/2000
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 07/18/2000
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/18/2000
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/18/2000
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 07/26/2000
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 09/12/2000
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/26/2000
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 09/28/2000
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 10/12/2000
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 10/12/2000
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 10/12/2000
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 10/25/2000
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 11/02/2000