Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 09/28/1999
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 09/28/1999
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 09/28/1999
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 09/28/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 09/28/1999
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44]* 09/28/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 09/28/1999
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40]* 09/28/1999
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 09/28/1999
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 09/28/1999
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36]* 09/28/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 09/28/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41]* 09/28/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 09/28/1999
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 09/28/1999
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 09/28/1999
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34]* 09/28/1999
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 09/28/1999
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 09/28/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 09/28/1999
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 09/28/1999
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 09/28/1999
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 09/28/1999
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21]* 09/28/1999
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 09/28/1999
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 09/28/1999
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30]* 09/28/1999
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 09/28/1999
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3]* 09/28/1999
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 09/28/1999
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32]* 09/28/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 09/28/1999
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 09/28/1999
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 09/28/1999
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27]* 09/28/1999
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 09/28/1999
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 09/28/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 09/28/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 09/28/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 09/28/1999
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 10/07/1999
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 10/07/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 10/07/1999
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 10/19/1999
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 10/19/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 10/19/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 03/23/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 05/24/2000
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 06/15/2000