Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 09/29/1999
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 09/29/1999
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 09/29/1999
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 09/29/1999
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 09/29/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 10/05/1999
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 03/09/2000
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 03/16/2000
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/28/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/28/2000
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 03/28/2000
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 04/03/2000
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 04/10/2000