Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 09/30/1999
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 09/30/1999
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 09/30/1999
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 09/30/1999
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 09/30/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 09/30/1999
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4]* 09/30/1999
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 09/30/1999
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 09/30/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 09/30/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 09/30/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 09/30/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 09/30/1999
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 09/30/1999
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 09/30/1999
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 09/30/1999
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 09/30/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 10/04/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 10/21/1999
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 10/25/1999
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 10/27/1999
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/27/1999
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 10/27/1999
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 10/28/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 11/01/1999
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 11/01/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 11/02/1999
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 11/08/1999
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2] 11/10/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 11/10/1999
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 11/10/1999
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 11/16/1999
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 11/18/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 02/07/2000
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 02/07/2000
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 02/08/2000
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 02/10/2000