Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 10/01/1999
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 10/01/1999
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 10/01/1999
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 10/01/1999
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 10/01/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 10/01/1999
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 10/01/1999
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 10/01/1999
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 10/01/1999
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21]* 10/01/1999
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 10/01/1999
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 10/01/1999
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 10/07/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 10/07/1999
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 10/07/1999
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 10/07/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 10/07/1999
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 10/07/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 10/07/1999
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/14/1999
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 10/14/1999
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 10/14/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 10/14/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 10/14/1999
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 10/14/1999
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 10/14/1999
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 10/14/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 10/21/1999
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 10/21/1999
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 10/21/1999
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 10/21/1999
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/21/1999
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 10/21/1999
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 10/21/1999
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 10/21/1999
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 10/21/1999
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 10/21/1999
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 10/28/1999
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1] 10/28/1999
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 10/28/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 10/28/1999
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 10/28/1999
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 10/28/1999
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 10/28/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 10/28/1999
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 11/08/1999
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 11/08/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 11/08/1999
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 11/08/1999
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 11/08/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 11/08/1999
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 11/08/1999
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 11/16/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 11/16/1999
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 11/16/1999
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 11/16/1999
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 11/16/1999
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 11/16/1999
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 11/16/1999
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 11/16/1999
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 11/18/1999
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 11/18/1999
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 11/18/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 11/18/1999
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 11/18/1999
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 11/18/1999
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 11/18/1999
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 11/18/1999
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 11/18/1999
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/15/2000
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 02/15/2000
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/01/2000
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 03/01/2000
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 03/08/2000
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 03/09/2000
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 03/09/2000
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 03/16/2000
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 03/16/2000
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 03/23/2000
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 03/23/2000
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/23/2000
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 04/13/2000
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 05/04/2000
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/04/2000