Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 10/04/1999
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 10/04/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 10/04/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 10/04/1999
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 10/04/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 03/14/2000
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/22/2000
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 03/22/2000
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 03/22/2000
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 03/22/2000
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 03/22/2000
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 03/22/2000
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 03/22/2000
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 03/22/2000
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/29/2000
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/29/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/29/2000
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/29/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 03/29/2000
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/29/2000
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/29/2000
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/29/2000
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 03/29/2000
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/29/2000
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 03/29/2000
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 03/29/2000
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/29/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 04/04/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/04/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/04/2000
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 04/04/2000
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 04/04/2000
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/04/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/04/2000
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/13/2000
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 04/13/2000
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 04/13/2000
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/04/2000
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/04/2000
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1] 05/04/2000
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/04/2000
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/04/2000
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 05/15/2000
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/15/2000
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/25/2000
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 05/25/2000
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/25/2000
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/25/2000
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/25/2000
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 06/08/2000
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/15/2000
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/18/2000
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/18/2000
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 07/18/2000
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 07/18/2000
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/20/2000
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/20/2000
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 07/20/2000
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 07/20/2000
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/25/2000
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/25/2000
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 07/25/2000
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/25/2000
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 07/25/2000
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 07/27/2000
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/27/2000
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 07/27/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/27/2000
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/13/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/13/2000
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 09/18/2000
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 09/18/2000
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 09/18/2000
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/06/2000
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 10/06/2000