There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for interim continuation of administration of motor carrier functions by the Federal Highway Administration.


Actions Overview (6)

Date
10/19/1999Became Public Law No: 106-73. (TXT | PDF)
10/19/1999Signed by President.
10/18/1999Presented to President.
10/14/1999Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S12653-12654)
10/12/1999Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H9872)
10/07/1999Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
10/19/1999Became Public Law No: 106-73. (TXT | PDF)
10/19/1999Signed by President.
10/18/1999HousePresented to President.
10/15/1999SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/14/1999SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S12653-12654)
10/13/1999SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
10/12/1999-7:23pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
10/12/1999-7:23pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/12/1999-7:23pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9872)
10/12/1999-7:04pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3036.
10/12/1999-7:04pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9872-9875)
10/12/1999-7:04pmHouseMr. Petri moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
10/07/1999HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
10/07/1999HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 10/07/1999
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 10/07/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 10/07/1999

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure10/07/1999 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3036.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3036. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (10/12/1999)

Amends the Department of Transportation and Related Agencies Appropriations Act, 2000 to prohibit the Federal Highway Administrator from carrying out the duties and functions of the Secretary of Transportation with respect to the enforcement of Federal motor carrier safety laws (effectively restoring such authority to the Department of Transportation).