Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 10/12/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 10/28/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 10/28/1999
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 10/28/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/28/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 10/28/1999
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 10/28/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 10/28/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/28/1999
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 10/28/1999
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 11/02/1999
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/02/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 11/03/1999
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 11/03/1999
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 11/03/1999
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/04/1999
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 11/04/1999
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 11/04/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 11/04/1999
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 11/04/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 11/05/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 11/10/1999
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 11/10/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 11/10/1999
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 11/10/1999
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 11/17/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 02/16/2000
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/15/2000
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 03/21/2000
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 03/23/2000
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 05/25/2000