Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 10/19/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/26/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 10/26/1999
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 11/18/1999
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/02/2000
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 02/02/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 02/16/2000
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 02/29/2000
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/29/2000
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/22/2000
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 05/17/2000
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 05/18/2000
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/22/2000
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/12/2000