Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 10/14/1999
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 10/14/1999
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 10/14/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 10/14/1999
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 10/14/1999
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 10/14/1999
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 10/14/1999
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 10/14/1999
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 10/14/1999
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2]* 10/14/1999
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 10/14/1999
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 10/14/1999
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 10/14/1999
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 10/14/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 10/14/1999
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 10/14/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 10/14/1999
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 10/14/1999
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9]* 10/14/1999
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 10/14/1999
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 10/14/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 10/14/1999
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 10/14/1999
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large]* 10/14/1999
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 10/14/1999
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 10/14/1999
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3]* 10/14/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 10/14/1999
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5]* 10/14/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 10/14/1999
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 10/14/1999
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 10/14/1999
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6]* 10/14/1999
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22]* 10/14/1999
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 10/14/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 10/14/1999
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 10/14/1999
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 10/14/1999
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 10/14/1999
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 10/14/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 10/14/1999
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 10/14/1999
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6]* 10/14/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 10/14/1999
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 10/18/1999
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 10/18/1999
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 10/18/1999
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 10/18/1999
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 10/18/1999
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 10/19/1999
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 10/20/1999
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 10/20/1999
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 10/21/1999
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 10/21/1999
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 10/27/1999
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 10/28/1999
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 11/02/1999
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 11/02/1999
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 11/02/1999
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 11/02/1999
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 11/05/1999
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 11/05/1999
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 11/05/1999
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 11/05/1999
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 11/05/1999
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 11/05/1999
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 11/05/1999
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 11/05/1999
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2] 11/05/1999
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 11/05/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 11/05/1999
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 11/05/1999
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 11/05/1999
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 11/05/1999
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 11/05/1999