There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to prohibit certain allocations of S corporation stock held by an employee stock ownership plan.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
10/14/1999Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
10/14/1999Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/14/1999Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (46)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 10/14/1999
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 10/14/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 10/14/1999
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 10/14/1999
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 10/14/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 10/14/1999
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 10/14/1999
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 10/14/1999
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6]* 10/14/1999
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 10/14/1999
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 10/14/1999
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 10/14/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 10/14/1999
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 10/14/1999
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 10/14/1999
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 10/18/1999
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 10/19/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 10/19/1999
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 10/27/1999
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 10/28/1999
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 11/02/1999
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 11/02/1999
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 11/05/1999
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 11/18/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 01/27/2000
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 01/27/2000
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 05/11/2000
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/11/2000
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/11/2000
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 05/11/2000
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/11/2000
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 05/11/2000
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 05/11/2000
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 05/16/2000
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 05/16/2000
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 06/07/2000
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/08/2000
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/14/2000
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 06/21/2000
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 06/29/2000
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 07/13/2000
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 07/26/2000
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 07/27/2000
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/07/2000
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 09/12/2000
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/26/2000

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means10/14/1999 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3082. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/14/1999)

Amends the Internal Revenue Code to prohibit certain allocations of S corporation stock held by an employee stock ownership plan.