Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 10/14/1999
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 10/14/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 10/14/1999
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 10/14/1999
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 10/14/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 10/14/1999
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 10/14/1999
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 10/14/1999
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6]* 10/14/1999
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 10/14/1999
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 10/14/1999
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 10/14/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 10/14/1999
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 10/14/1999
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 10/14/1999
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 10/18/1999
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 10/19/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 10/19/1999
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 10/27/1999
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 10/28/1999
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 11/02/1999
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 11/02/1999
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 11/05/1999
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 11/18/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 01/27/2000
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 01/27/2000
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 05/11/2000
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/11/2000
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/11/2000
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 05/11/2000
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/11/2000
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 05/11/2000
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 05/11/2000
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 05/16/2000
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 05/16/2000
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 06/07/2000
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/08/2000
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/14/2000
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 06/21/2000
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 06/29/2000
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 07/13/2000
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 07/26/2000
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 07/27/2000
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/07/2000
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 09/12/2000
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/26/2000