Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 10/25/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 10/25/1999
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 10/25/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 10/25/1999
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 10/25/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 10/25/1999
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/25/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/02/1999
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 11/02/1999
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 11/02/1999
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 11/02/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 11/02/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 11/02/1999
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 11/02/1999
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/02/1999
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 11/02/1999
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 11/02/1999
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 11/02/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 11/02/1999
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/02/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 11/02/1999
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 11/02/1999
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 11/02/1999
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 11/03/1999
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 11/03/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/03/1999
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 11/03/1999
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 11/03/1999
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 11/03/1999
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 11/03/1999
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 11/03/1999
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 11/03/1999
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 11/03/1999
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 11/03/1999
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 11/03/1999
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 11/03/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 11/03/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 11/04/1999
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 11/04/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 11/04/1999
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 11/04/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 11/04/1999
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 11/04/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 11/04/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/04/1999
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 11/04/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 11/04/1999
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/04/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 11/04/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/08/1999
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 11/08/1999
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 11/08/1999
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 11/08/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 11/08/1999
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 11/08/1999
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 11/08/1999
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 11/08/1999
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 11/09/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 11/09/1999
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/09/1999
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/09/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 11/09/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 11/09/1999
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 11/09/1999
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 11/09/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 11/09/1999
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 11/09/1999
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 11/09/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 11/09/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 11/09/1999
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 11/09/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 11/09/1999
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 11/09/1999
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 11/17/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/17/1999
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 11/17/1999
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 11/17/1999
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 11/17/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 11/17/1999
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 11/17/1999
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 11/17/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 11/17/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/17/1999
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/17/1999
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 11/17/1999
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 11/17/1999
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 11/17/1999
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/17/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 11/17/1999
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 11/17/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 11/17/1999
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/17/1999
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 11/17/1999
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 11/17/1999
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 11/17/1999
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 11/17/1999
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/17/1999
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 11/17/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 11/17/1999
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 11/17/1999
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/17/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 11/17/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 11/17/1999
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 11/17/1999
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 11/17/1999
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 11/17/1999
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 11/17/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 11/17/1999
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 11/17/1999
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 11/17/1999
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 11/17/1999
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 11/17/1999
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 11/17/1999
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 11/17/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 11/17/1999
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 11/17/1999
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 11/17/1999
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 11/17/1999
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 11/17/1999
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 11/17/1999
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/18/1999
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 11/18/1999
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 11/18/1999
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 11/18/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 11/18/1999
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 11/18/1999
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 11/18/1999
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 11/18/1999
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 11/18/1999
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 11/18/1999
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 11/18/1999
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 11/18/1999
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 11/18/1999
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 11/18/1999
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 11/18/1999
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 11/18/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 11/18/1999
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 11/18/1999
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 11/18/1999
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 11/18/1999
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 11/18/1999
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 11/18/1999
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 11/18/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 11/18/1999
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 11/22/1999
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 11/22/1999
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 11/22/1999
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 01/31/2000
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 01/31/2000
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 01/31/2000
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 01/31/2000
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 01/31/2000
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 01/31/2000
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 01/31/2000
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 01/31/2000
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 01/31/2000
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 01/31/2000
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/31/2000
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 01/31/2000
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 01/31/2000
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 01/31/2000
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/02/2000
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1] 02/02/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 02/10/2000
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 02/10/2000
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/15/2000
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/15/2000
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 02/16/2000
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 02/16/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 03/01/2000
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/01/2000
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/01/2000
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/01/2000
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 03/01/2000
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 03/01/2000
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/09/2000
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 03/21/2000
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 03/23/2000
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/23/2000
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/09/2000
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 05/09/2000
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/09/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 05/09/2000
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/18/2000
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/22/2000
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/22/2000
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 06/08/2000
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 06/29/2000
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/12/2000
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 07/12/2000
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 07/12/2000
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/12/2000
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 07/18/2000
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 07/24/2000
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/24/2000
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 07/24/2000
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/24/2000
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [R-CA-31] 09/12/2000
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 09/12/2000
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 09/12/2000
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 09/12/2000
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/12/2000