Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 10/27/1999
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 10/27/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 10/27/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 10/27/1999
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 10/27/1999
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 10/27/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 10/27/1999
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 11/02/1999
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 11/02/1999
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 11/02/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 11/04/1999
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 11/04/1999
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 11/04/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 11/04/1999
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 11/04/1999
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 11/09/1999
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 11/09/1999
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 11/09/1999
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 11/09/1999
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 11/09/1999
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 11/16/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/16/1999
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/18/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 01/31/2000
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/08/2000
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 02/08/2000
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/14/2000
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 03/14/2000
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/03/2000
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 04/05/2000
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 04/05/2000
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/05/2000
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/05/2000
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/13/2000
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 04/13/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/08/2000
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 06/08/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 06/08/2000
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 06/08/2000
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 06/12/2000
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 06/12/2000
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 06/12/2000
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/12/2000
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 06/12/2000
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/15/2000
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/15/2000
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/15/2000
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/15/2000
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 06/21/2000
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 06/21/2000
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 06/21/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/22/2000
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 06/29/2000
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/19/2000
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 07/19/2000
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 09/06/2000
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 09/06/2000
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 09/06/2000