Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 10/19/1999
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 10/19/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 10/19/1999
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 10/19/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 10/19/1999
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 10/19/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 10/19/1999
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 10/19/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 10/19/1999
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 10/19/1999
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 10/19/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 10/19/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 10/19/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 10/19/1999
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 10/19/1999
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 10/19/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/27/1999
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 11/02/1999
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/02/1999
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 11/05/1999
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 01/27/2000
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/01/2000
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 04/11/2000
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/24/2000
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/25/2000
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/25/2000
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 07/25/2000
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/25/2000
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 07/25/2000
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 07/27/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 07/27/2000
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/27/2000
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 07/27/2000
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 07/27/2000
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/27/2000
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 07/27/2000
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/27/2000
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 09/07/2000
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 09/07/2000
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 09/07/2000
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/07/2000