Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 10/20/1999
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 02/10/2000
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 06/13/2000
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/22/2000
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 07/18/2000
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 09/13/2000