Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 10/21/1999
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 10/21/1999
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 10/21/1999
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 10/21/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 10/21/1999
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 11/22/1999
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 04/06/2000
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/10/2000
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 04/10/2000
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/10/2000
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 04/10/2000
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/10/2000
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2] 04/13/2000
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 04/13/2000
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 05/10/2000
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 05/10/2000
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/10/2000
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/10/2000
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/11/2000
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 05/11/2000
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/15/2000
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 05/15/2000
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 05/19/2000
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/19/2000
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 05/19/2000
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/19/2000
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 05/19/2000
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 06/07/2000
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/07/2000
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 06/09/2000
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 06/09/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 06/19/2000
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 06/19/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 06/21/2000