Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 10/25/1999
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 10/25/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 10/25/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 10/25/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 10/25/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 10/25/1999
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 10/25/1999
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 10/25/1999
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 10/25/1999
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 10/25/1999
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 10/25/1999
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6]* 10/25/1999
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 10/25/1999
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 10/25/1999
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 10/25/1999
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9]* 10/25/1999
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 10/25/1999
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 10/25/1999
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 10/25/1999
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7]* 10/25/1999
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 10/25/1999
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 10/25/1999
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 10/25/1999
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/08/1999
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 11/08/1999
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 11/08/1999
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 11/08/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 11/08/1999
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 11/08/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/08/1999
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 11/08/1999
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 11/08/1999
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 11/08/1999
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 11/08/1999
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 11/08/1999
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 11/08/1999
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 11/08/1999
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/08/1999
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 11/08/1999
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 11/08/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 11/08/1999
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 11/08/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 11/08/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 11/08/1999
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 11/18/1999
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 11/18/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 11/18/1999
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/18/1999
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 11/18/1999
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 11/18/1999
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 11/18/1999
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/10/2000
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 02/10/2000
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 04/04/2000
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/02/2000
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 05/15/2000
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/15/2000

Show cosponsors who withdrew