Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 02/09/2000
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 02/09/2000
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 02/09/2000
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 02/09/2000
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 02/09/2000
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 02/09/2000
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 02/10/2000
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 02/10/2000
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 03/14/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/14/2000
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 03/14/2000
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 05/03/2000
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 05/25/2000