Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 11/10/1999
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 11/17/1999
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/01/2000
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 02/02/2000
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 02/15/2000
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/11/2000
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/11/2000
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/11/2000
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/11/2000
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/11/2000
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/11/2000
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/12/2000
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/04/2000
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/04/2000
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/06/2000
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 06/20/2000
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/23/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/13/2000
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/13/2000
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 07/17/2000
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/14/2000
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/14/2000
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/02/2000