Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 11/09/1999
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 11/09/1999
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 11/09/1999
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 11/09/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 11/09/1999
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 11/09/1999
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 11/09/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 11/09/1999
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 11/09/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 11/09/1999
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 11/09/1999
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 11/18/1999
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 11/18/1999
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 11/18/1999
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 03/08/2000
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 03/08/2000
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 04/04/2000
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 04/04/2000