Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 10/28/1999
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 10/28/1999
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 11/10/1999
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 11/10/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 11/10/1999
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 11/10/1999
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 11/10/1999
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 11/10/1999
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 11/10/1999
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 11/16/1999
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 02/01/2000
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 02/01/2000
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 02/01/2000
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 02/14/2000
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/29/2000
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/01/2000
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 03/09/2000
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 03/09/2000
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/09/2000
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 04/11/2000
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 05/08/2000
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 09/28/2000