Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 01/06/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 02/24/1999
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/24/1999
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 02/24/1999
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 02/24/1999
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/02/1999
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 03/02/1999
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 04/15/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/21/1999
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 02/29/2000