Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 11/01/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 11/02/1999
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 11/04/1999
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 11/04/1999
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 11/04/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 11/05/1999
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 11/08/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 11/08/1999
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 11/08/1999
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 11/09/1999
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 11/09/1999
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 11/09/1999
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 11/09/1999
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 11/16/1999
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 11/16/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 11/17/1999
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 11/17/1999
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 11/18/1999
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 02/01/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/01/2000
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 02/01/2000
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 02/01/2000
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 02/01/2000
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 02/01/2000
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 02/10/2000
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 03/01/2000
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 03/06/2000
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/08/2000
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 03/08/2000
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 03/15/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 03/27/2000
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 04/03/2000
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 05/18/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 05/18/2000
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 06/08/2000
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/14/2000
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/23/2000
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/23/2000
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/29/2000