Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 11/02/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 11/02/1999
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 11/02/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 11/02/1999
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 11/02/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 11/02/1999
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 11/02/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 11/02/1999
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 11/03/1999
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 11/09/1999
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 11/10/1999
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 11/18/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/18/1999
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 11/18/1999
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 11/18/1999
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 11/18/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 11/18/1999
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 01/27/2000
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 01/27/2000
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 01/27/2000
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 01/27/2000
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 01/27/2000
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 01/27/2000
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 01/27/2000
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 01/27/2000
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 01/27/2000
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 01/27/2000
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 01/27/2000
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 01/27/2000
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 01/27/2000
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 01/27/2000
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 01/27/2000
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/27/2000
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 01/27/2000
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 01/27/2000
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 01/27/2000
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 01/27/2000
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 02/01/2000
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 02/01/2000
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 02/01/2000
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 02/01/2000
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 02/01/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/01/2000
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/01/2000
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/02/2000
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 02/07/2000
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 02/07/2000
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/07/2000
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 02/07/2000
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 02/08/2000
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 02/08/2000
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 02/08/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/08/2000
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 02/08/2000
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 02/10/2000
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 02/10/2000
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/10/2000
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/10/2000
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 02/10/2000
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 02/10/2000
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/10/2000
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 02/10/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/10/2000
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 02/14/2000
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 02/15/2000
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 02/15/2000
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/15/2000
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 02/15/2000
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/15/2000
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 02/16/2000
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 02/16/2000
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 02/29/2000
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 02/29/2000
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/29/2000
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 02/29/2000
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 02/29/2000
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 02/29/2000
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 02/29/2000
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 02/29/2000
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 02/29/2000
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 02/29/2000
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/01/2000
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 03/06/2000
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/06/2000
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 03/06/2000
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/08/2000
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 03/08/2000
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 03/08/2000
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 03/08/2000
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 03/08/2000
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 03/08/2000
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/08/2000
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 03/09/2000
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 03/14/2000
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 03/14/2000
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 03/14/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/14/2000
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/14/2000
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/14/2000
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 03/14/2000
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 03/15/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/15/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/15/2000
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 03/15/2000
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 03/15/2000
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 03/15/2000
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 03/15/2000
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 03/15/2000
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/21/2000
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/21/2000
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/21/2000
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 03/21/2000
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/22/2000
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 03/22/2000
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 03/22/2000
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/29/2000
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 03/29/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 03/29/2000
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/29/2000
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/29/2000
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 03/29/2000
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/29/2000
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/29/2000
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 03/29/2000
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/29/2000
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 04/03/2000
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/03/2000
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 04/04/2000
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 04/04/2000
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/05/2000
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 04/05/2000
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/05/2000
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/05/2000
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 04/05/2000
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 04/11/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/11/2000
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/13/2000
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/13/2000
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 04/13/2000
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/02/2000
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 05/02/2000
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 05/02/2000
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/02/2000
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/02/2000
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/02/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/04/2000
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 05/04/2000
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 05/04/2000
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/08/2000
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 05/10/2000
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 05/15/2000
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 05/15/2000
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 05/16/2000
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 05/16/2000
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/16/2000
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 05/19/2000
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 05/19/2000
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/25/2000
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 05/25/2000
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 06/07/2000
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1] 06/07/2000
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 06/14/2000
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 06/14/2000
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 06/14/2000
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 06/15/2000
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 06/20/2000
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/20/2000
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 06/20/2000
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/20/2000
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 06/26/2000
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 06/26/2000
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 06/26/2000
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/28/2000
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 07/10/2000
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 07/10/2000
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 07/10/2000
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/10/2000
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 07/10/2000
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 07/10/2000
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/11/2000
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/11/2000
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 07/11/2000
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 07/12/2000
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 07/13/2000
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 07/13/2000
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 07/17/2000
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 07/17/2000
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/18/2000
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/19/2000
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/26/2000
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 09/11/2000
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/12/2000