Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 11/04/1999
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 11/04/1999
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 11/04/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 11/04/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 11/04/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2]* 11/04/1999
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 11/04/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 11/04/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 11/04/1999
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 11/04/1999
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 11/04/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 11/04/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 11/04/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 11/04/1999
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 11/04/1999
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3]* 11/04/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 11/04/1999
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 11/04/1999
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 11/04/1999
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 11/04/1999
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 11/04/1999
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 11/04/1999
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 11/04/1999
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 11/08/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 11/08/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 11/08/1999
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 11/18/1999
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 11/22/1999
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/27/2000
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 01/27/2000
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 01/27/2000
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 01/27/2000
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 01/27/2000
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 01/27/2000
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/08/2000
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 02/08/2000
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1] 02/08/2000
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/08/2000
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/08/2000
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 02/10/2000
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 02/10/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 02/14/2000
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 02/14/2000
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 03/14/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/14/2000
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 03/14/2000
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/21/2000
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 04/11/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 05/02/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/04/2000