Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 11/05/1999
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 11/17/1999
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 11/17/1999
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 11/18/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 11/18/1999
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/27/2000
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 01/27/2000
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 01/27/2000
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 01/27/2000
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 01/31/2000
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/02/2000
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 02/08/2000
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 02/08/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 02/08/2000
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/10/2000
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/15/2000
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 02/15/2000
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 02/15/2000
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 02/15/2000
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 02/29/2000
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 02/29/2000
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 02/29/2000
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 02/29/2000
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 02/29/2000
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/29/2000
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 02/29/2000
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 02/29/2000
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/29/2000
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 02/29/2000
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 02/29/2000
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/29/2000
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/29/2000
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/29/2000
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 02/29/2000
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 02/29/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/29/2000
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/29/2000
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 03/06/2000
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/06/2000
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/06/2000
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 03/08/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 03/08/2000
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 03/08/2000
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/16/2000
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/16/2000
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/23/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/30/2000
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/30/2000
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 04/04/2000
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 04/04/2000
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 04/05/2000
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 04/05/2000
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 04/11/2000
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/02/2000
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 05/02/2000
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 05/02/2000
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/02/2000
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 05/02/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 05/02/2000
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 05/03/2000
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 05/03/2000
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/03/2000
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/10/2000
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/10/2000
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/24/2000
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/06/2000
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 06/06/2000
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 06/22/2000
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 07/11/2000
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/12/2000
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/12/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/19/2000
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/19/2000
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/24/2000
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 09/06/2000
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/06/2000
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 09/07/2000
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 09/12/2000