Committees: H.R.3244 — 106th Congress (1999-2000)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House International Relations11/08/1999 Referred to
11/09/1999 Markup by
11/22/1999 Reported by H. Rept. 106-487,Part 1
House Judiciary11/08/1999 Referred to
04/04/2000 Markup by
04/13/2000 Reported by H. Rept. 106-487,Part 2
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Claims02/23/2000 Referred to
05/08/2000 Markup by
03/08/2000 Reported by
House Banking and Financial Services11/08/1999 Referred to
04/14/2000 Discharged from
House Banking and Financial Services Subcommittee on Domestic and International Monetary Policy12/02/1999 Referred to
House Ways and Means03/09/2000 Referred to