Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 11/08/1999
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 11/08/1999
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 11/08/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 11/08/1999
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 11/08/1999
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 11/08/1999
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 11/08/1999
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 11/08/1999
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 11/15/1999
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 01/27/2000
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 01/27/2000
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 01/27/2000
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 01/27/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 01/27/2000
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 01/27/2000
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/29/2000
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/29/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/29/2000
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/14/2000
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/21/2000
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 03/21/2000
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 05/02/2000
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/02/2000
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/04/2000
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 05/08/2000
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 05/08/2000
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 05/08/2000
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/08/2000
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/08/2000
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/08/2000
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 05/08/2000
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 05/08/2000
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 05/08/2000
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 05/08/2000
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 05/08/2000
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 05/08/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 05/08/2000