Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 11/08/1999
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 11/16/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 11/16/1999
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 11/17/1999
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 11/17/1999
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 11/17/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 11/18/1999
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 11/18/1999
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 11/22/1999
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 11/22/1999
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 03/15/2000
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 03/15/2000
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 04/12/2000
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 06/09/2000