Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 11/08/1999
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 01/27/2000
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 01/27/2000
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 02/03/2000
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 02/03/2000
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 02/08/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 02/15/2000
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/16/2000
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 03/16/2000

Show cosponsors who withdrew