Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 11/08/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 11/08/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 11/08/1999
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 11/08/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 11/08/1999
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 11/08/1999
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4]* 11/08/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 11/08/1999
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 11/08/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2]* 11/08/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 11/08/1999
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 11/08/1999
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 11/08/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 11/08/1999
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 11/08/1999
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 11/08/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 11/08/1999
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 11/08/1999
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 11/08/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 11/08/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 11/08/1999
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 11/08/1999
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 11/08/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 11/08/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 11/08/1999
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 11/08/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 11/08/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 11/08/1999
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7]* 11/08/1999
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 11/08/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 11/08/1999
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 11/08/1999
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large]* 11/08/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 11/08/1999
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 11/08/1999
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 11/08/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 11/08/1999
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 11/08/1999
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19]* 11/08/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 11/08/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 11/08/1999
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 11/08/1999
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 11/08/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 11/08/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1]* 11/08/1999
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 11/08/1999
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 11/08/1999
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 11/08/1999
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 11/08/1999
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 01/24/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/03/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/07/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 02/07/2000
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 02/07/2000
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 02/29/2000
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/06/2000
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 03/06/2000
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/08/2000
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 03/29/2000
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 05/02/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 05/02/2000
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 05/19/2000
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/23/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/24/2000
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/20/2000
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 07/10/2000
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 07/19/2000
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 07/19/2000
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 07/19/2000
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 07/19/2000
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 07/19/2000
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/19/2000
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/07/2000
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 10/05/2000