Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 11/09/1999
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 11/15/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 11/15/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 11/18/1999
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 11/18/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 11/18/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 11/18/1999
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 03/13/2000
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 07/27/2000